WA HB1825 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the placement and treatment of conditionally released sexually violent predators.
Title
Concerning the placement and treatment of conditionally released sexually violent predators.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-02-21 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-21 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-21 | House | PS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-21 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-31 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5941 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.