WA HB1837 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - Referred to Public Safety.
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - Referred to Public Safety.
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing penalties for certain repeat offenders who engage in lurid criminal conduct.
Title
Increasing penalties for certain repeat offenders who engage in lurid criminal conduct.
Sponsors
Rep. Morgan Irwin [R] | Rep. Daniel Griffey [R] | Rep. Drew Stokesbary [R] | Rep. Brandon Vick [R] |
Rep. Tina Orwall [D] | Rep. Norma Smith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | Referred to Public Safety. |
2020-01-13 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-21 | House | PS - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-01 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1837&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1837.pdf |