WA HB1838 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting certain licensed distillery information from public disclosure.
Title
Exempting certain licensed distillery information from public disclosure.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Walsh [R] | Rep. Keith Goehner [R] | Rep. Zack Hudgins [D] | Rep. Mia Gregerson [D] |
Sen. Derek Stanford [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-09 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-21 | Senate | Returned to Rules Committee for third reading. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
2019-03-09 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-03-09 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-01 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-20 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-18 | House | COG - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-18 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-01 | House | First reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5750 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.