WA HB1841 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-18)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing minimum crew size on certain trains.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing minimum crew size on certain trains.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-10 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 64 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-27HouseEffective date 6/11/2020.
2020-03-27HouseChapter 170, 2020 Laws PV.
2020-03-27HouseGovernor partially vetoed.
2020-03-12HouseDelivered to Governor.
2020-03-12SenatePresident signed.
2020-03-11HouseSpeaker signed.
2020-03-10HousePassed final passage; yeas, 64; nays, 33; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-03-10HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments.
2020-03-06SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 34; nays, 15; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2020-03-06SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-03-06SenateFloor amendment
2020-03-06SenateCommittee amendment not adopted.
2020-03-02SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2020-02-26SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-02-26SenateMinority; do not pass.
2020-02-25SenateLBRC - Majority; do pass with amendment
2020-02-25SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 12:00 PM.
2020-02-20SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:30 AM.
2020-02-03SenateFirst reading, referred to Labor & Commerce.
2020-01-30SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 65; nays, 30; absent, 0; excused, 3.
2020-01-28SenatePlaced on third reading by Rules Committee.
2020-01-13SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2019-04-28SenateBy resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2019-04-17SenateHeld on second reading.
2019-04-11SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-04-03SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-04-02SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-04-02SenateLBRC - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-04-02SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 1:00 PM.
2019-03-26SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:30 AM.
2019-03-15SenateFirst reading, referred to Labor & Commerce.
2019-03-13HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 72; nays, 24; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-03-13HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-01HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-21HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-02-18HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2019-02-18HouseLAWS - Majority; do pass.
2019-02-18HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-14HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM.
2019-02-01HouseFirst reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards.

Same As/Similar To

SB5877 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1841&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1841.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/1841.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/1841.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=119009&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-13-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1841&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=119009&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=01-30-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1841&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=119009&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-06-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1841&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=119009&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-10-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1841&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback