WA HB1843 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-15)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Safeguarding the public safety by protecting railroad workers.
Title
Safeguarding the public safety by protecting railroad workers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2019-03-08 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-18 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-18 | House | LAWS - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-18 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-01 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5879 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1843&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1843.pdf |