WA HB1847 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing aircraft noise abatement.
Title
Addressing aircraft noise abatement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-25 | House | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-25 | House | Chapter 105, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-25 | House | Governor signed. |
2020-03-11 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 33; nays, 15; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | LGOV - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 58; nays, 37; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | LGOV - Majority; do pass. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2019-03-04 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 55; nays, 41; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-03-04 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-04 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-01 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-20 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-20 | House | LG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-20 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-12 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-01 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |