WA HB1854 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - Referred to Innovation, Technology & Economic Development.
Pending: House Innovation, Technology & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - Referred to Innovation, Technology & Economic Development.
Pending: House Innovation, Technology & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Protecting consumer data.
Title
Protecting consumer data.
Sponsors
Rep. Shelley Kloba [D] | Rep. Zack Hudgins [D] | Rep. Vandana Slatter [D] | Rep. Gael Tarleton [D] |
Rep. Norma Smith [R] | Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] | Sen. Javier Valdez [D] | Sen. Derek Stanford [D] |
Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | Referred to Innovation, Technology & Economic Development. |
2020-01-13 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-01 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-28 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-28 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-28 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-02-22 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-22 | House | ITED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-20 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-19 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-15 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-12 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-01 | House | First reading, referred to Innovation, Technology & Economic Development. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5376 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - Senate Rules "X" file.