WA HB1871 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning prison safety.
Title
Concerning prison safety.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-01-23 | House | PS - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-13 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | House | Referred to Public Safety. |
2020-01-13 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2019-02-28 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-19 | House | PS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-18 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-04 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5888 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.