WA HB1873 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Effective date 10/1/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Effective date 10/1/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the taxation of vapor products as tobacco products.
Title
Concerning the taxation of vapor products as tobacco products.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-28 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 56 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 35 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 35 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | House | Effective date 10/1/2019. |
2019-05-21 | House | Chapter 445, 2019 Laws. |
2019-05-21 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-28 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-28 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-28 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 56; nays, 42; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-04-28 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 35; nays, 13; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2019-04-28 | Senate | Committee amendment not adopted. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-04-27 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-04-27 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-04-27 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-04-27 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-04-26 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 58; nays, 38; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-04-26 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-26 | House | Floor amendment |
2019-04-26 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2019-04-25 | House | Placed on second reading. |
2019-04-22 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-04-22 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-04-22 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-04-22 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-19 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-03-14 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-03-14 | House | FIN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-03-14 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-04 | House | First reading, referred to Finance. |