WA HB1876 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning children's mental health.
Title
Concerning children's mental health.
Sponsors
Sen. Noel Frame [D] | Rep. Carolyn Eslick [R] | Rep. Sherry Appleton [D] | Rep. Lauren Davis [D] |
Rep. Steve Bergquist [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] | Rep. Beth Doglio [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-20 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-02-15 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-15 | House | HSEL - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-15 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-13 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-06 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-04 | House | First reading, referred to Human Services & Early Learning. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5903 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-09 - Effective date 7/28/2019*.