WA HB1896 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - Referred to Public Safety.
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - Referred to Public Safety.
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Promoting fair and proportional sentencing by modifying scoring provisions in the sentencing reform act.
Title
Promoting fair and proportional sentencing by modifying scoring provisions in the sentencing reform act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | Referred to Public Safety. |
2020-01-13 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2019-03-05 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-21 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-21 | House | PS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-21 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-04 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety. |