WA HB1900 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Effective date 7/28/2019*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Effective date 7/28/2019*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Maximizing federal funding for prevention and family services and programs.
Title
Maximizing federal funding for prevention and family services and programs.
Sponsors
Rep. Lisa Callan [D] | Rep. Tom Dent [R] | Rep. Tana Senn [D] | Rep. Sherry Appleton [D] |
Rep. Beth Doglio [D] | Rep. Lauren Davis [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] | Sen. Noel Frame [D] |
Rep. Laurie Jinkins [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-18 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | House | Effective date 7/28/2019*. |
2019-04-29 | House | Chapter 172, 2019 Laws. |
2019-04-29 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-25 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-23 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-18 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 94; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2019-04-18 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | HSRR - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. |
2019-03-11 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-03-11 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-04 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-03-01 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-28 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-02-15 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-15 | House | HSEL - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-15 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-13 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-05 | House | First reading, referred to Human Services & Early Learning. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5826 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - Senate Rules "X" file.