WA HB1938 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a local infrastructure investment program to support the development of affordable housing, workforce housing, and revitalization efforts.
Title
Creating a local infrastructure investment program to support the development of affordable housing, workforce housing, and revitalization efforts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-21 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-18 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-11 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass 3rd substitute bill proposed by Housing, Community Development & Veterans. |
2020-02-10 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-07 | House | Referred to Finance. |
2020-02-05 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-05 | House | HOUS - Majority; 3rd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-24 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-17 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-13 | House | Referred to Housing, Community Development & Veterans. |
2020-01-13 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-09 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-03-08 | House | FIN - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-03-08 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Finance. |
2019-02-20 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-20 | House | HOUS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-20 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-19 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-06 | House | First reading, referred to Housing, Community Development & Veterans. |