WA HB1939 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning housing and supportive services for homeless and at-risk veterans in rural areas.
Title
Concerning housing and supportive services for homeless and at-risk veterans in rural areas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-02-19 | House | HOUS - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-12 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-06 | House | First reading, referred to Housing, Community Development & Veterans. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1939&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1939.pdf |