WA HB1941 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Conducting a comprehensive review of the impact of catastrophic wildfires on communities as a means of improving government responses for the future.
Title
Conducting a comprehensive review of the impact of catastrophic wildfires on communities as a means of improving government responses for the future.
Sponsors
Rep. Joel Kretz [R] | Rep. Brian Blake [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-02-22 | House | RDAN - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-22 | House | Vote on final passage will be reconsidered. |
2019-02-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-06 | House | First reading, referred to Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1941&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1941.pdf |