WA HB1970 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the reliability of evidence in criminal proceedings.
Title
Concerning the reliability of evidence in criminal proceedings.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Pellicciotti [D] | Rep. Roger Goodman [D] | Rep. Tina Orwall [D] | Rep. Sherry Appleton [D] |
Rep. Lauren Davis [D] | Rep. Marcus Riccelli [D] | Rep. Matt Shea [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-08 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5714 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-09 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1970&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1970.pdf |