WA HB1973 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Washington dual enrollment scholarship pilot program.
Title
Establishing the Washington dual enrollment scholarship pilot program.
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Paul [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] | Rep. Steve Bergquist [D] | Rep. Michael Sells [D] |
Rep. Marcus Riccelli [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-18 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | House | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-04-29 | House | Chapter 176, 2019 Laws. |
2019-04-29 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-25 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-23 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-18 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 94; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2019-04-18 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2019-04-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at time TBA. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | HEWD - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | First reading, referred to Higher Education & Workforce Development. |
2019-03-05 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-03-05 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-05 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-04 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-03-01 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-28 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-28 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-02-20 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-20 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-20 | House | CWD - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-20 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-08 | House | First reading, referred to College & Workforce Development. |