WA HB1991 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - Referred to Transportation.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - Referred to Transportation.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing the use of digital license plates.
Title
Allowing the use of digital license plates.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | Referred to Transportation. |
2020-01-13 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-01 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-27 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-27 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-27 | House | TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-11 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |