WA HB1999 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Environment & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Environment & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reducing emissions by making changes to the clean car standards and clean car program.
Title
Reducing emissions by making changes to the clean car standards and clean car program.
Sponsors
Rep. Shelley Kloba [D] | Rep. Nicole Macri [D] | Sen. Derek Stanford [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
Rep. Beth Doglio [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-11 | House | First reading, referred to Environment & Energy. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5811 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-25 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1999&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1999.pdf |