WA HB2002 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creating the social work professional loan repayment program.
Title
Creating the social work professional loan repayment program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-07 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-02-05 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-05 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-05 | House | CWD - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-04 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-28 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-11 | House | First reading, referred to College & Workforce Development. |