WA HB2009 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a healthy environment for all by addressing environmental health disparities.
Title
Establishing a healthy environment for all by addressing environmental health disparities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-17 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 88 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Senate | House Rules "X" file. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Held at the Desk. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | First Reading. |
2019-04-17 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 88; nays, 10; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-04-17 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-17 | House | Floor amendment |
2019-04-17 | House | Placed on second reading. |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-02-19 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-19 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-19 | House | SGOV - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-11 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |