WA HB2012 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-20 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-20 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing equitable bonuses to K-12 instructional staff who attain national certification through professional organizations.
Title
Providing equitable bonuses to K-12 instructional staff who attain national certification through professional organizations.
Sponsors
Sen. Matt Boehnke [R] | Rep. Bill Ramos [D] | Rep. Jesse Young [R] | Rep. Monica Stonier [D] |
Rep. Paul Harris [R] | Rep. Laurie Dolan [D] | Rep. Michael Sells [D] | Rep. Morgan Irwin [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | House | Referred to Education. |
2020-01-13 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2019-03-09 | House | Placed on second reading. |
2019-03-09 | House | Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2019-02-12 | House | First reading, referred to Education. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5821 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=2012&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2012.pdf |