WA HB2015 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Effective date 7/28/2019*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Effective date 7/28/2019*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing funding for the Washington state library-archives building and operations of library and archives facilities.
Title
Providing funding for the Washington state library-archives building and operations of library and archives facilities.
Sponsors
Rep. Beth Doglio [D] | Rep. Richard DeBolt [R] | Rep. Laurie Dolan [D] | Rep. Jim Walsh [R] |
Rep. Brian Blake [D] | Rep. Lawrence Springer [D] | Rep. Gael Tarleton [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 92 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 41 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 41 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | House | Effective date 7/28/2019*. |
2019-05-21 | House | Chapter 448, 2019 Laws. |
2019-05-21 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-28 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-27 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-27 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-25 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 92; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-04-25 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 41; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Placed on second reading. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-04-09 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 92; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-04-09 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-09 | House | Floor amendment |
2019-04-09 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-04-03 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2019-03-05 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-26 | House | CB - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 9:00 AM. |
2019-02-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-12 | House | First reading, referred to Capital Budget. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5902 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.