WA HB2017 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Effective date 3/19/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Effective date 3/19/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning collective bargaining for administrative law judges.
Title
Concerning collective bargaining for administrative law judges.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | House | Effective date 3/19/2020. |
2020-03-19 | House | Chapter 77, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-19 | House | Governor signed. |
2020-03-09 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 29; nays, 18; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | LBRC - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:30 AM. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
2020-02-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 57; nays, 40; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-02-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-13 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-12 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-04 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-01-30 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-01-30 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-01-30 | House | APP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-30 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-29 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-02-19 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-19 | House | LAWS - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-12 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. |