WA HB2037 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Providing sergeants of the department of fish and wildlife interest arbitration under certain circumstances.
Title
Providing sergeants of the department of fish and wildlife interest arbitration under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2019-03-05 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-03-01 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-28 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-28 | House | APP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-02-19 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-19 | House | LAWS - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-14 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. |