WA HB2046 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Innovation, Technology & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Innovation, Technology & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing consumer data transparency.
Title
Increasing consumer data transparency.
Sponsors
Rep. Shelley Kloba [D] | Rep. Gael Tarleton [D] | Rep. Norma Smith [R] | Rep. Zack Hudgins [D] |
Rep. Vandana Slatter [D] | Sen. Noel Frame [D] | Sen. Derek Stanford [D] | Sen. Javier Valdez [D] |
Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-22 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-14 | House | First reading, referred to Innovation, Technology & Economic Development. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=2046&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2046.pdf |