WA HB2047 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning carbon sequestration on natural and working lands as part of the state’s climate change response.
Title
Concerning carbon sequestration on natural and working lands as part of the state’s climate change response.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | House | House Rules "X" file. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2019-03-11 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-03-01 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-28 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-28 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-02-22 | House | RDAN - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-22 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-22 | House | RDAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-14 | House | First reading, referred to Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources. |