WA HB2057 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 28-8)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning special privileges.
Title
Concerning special privileges.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | House | House Rules "X" file. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-22 | House | SGOV - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-15 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=2057&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2057.pdf |