WA HB2066 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Effective date 1/1/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Effective date 1/1/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing restrictions on driver's licenses associated with certain criminal offenses.
Title
Addressing restrictions on driver's licenses associated with certain criminal offenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | House | Effective date 1/1/2022. |
2020-03-18 | House | Chapter 16, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-18 | House | Governor signed. |
2020-03-09 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Transportation. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | And refer to Transportation. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-16 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | TR - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 12:00 PM. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Transportation. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | PS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Public Safety. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at time TBA. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | On motion, referred to Transportation. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2019-03-07 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-03-07 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-07 | House | Floor amendment |
2019-03-01 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-21 | House | PS - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-21 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-15 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety. |