WA HB2070 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying the required color of certain lamps on vehicles.
Title
Clarifying the required color of certain lamps on vehicles.
Sponsors
Sen. John Lovick [D] | Rep. Tom Dent [R] | Rep. Daniel Griffey [R] | Rep. Mari Leavitt [D] |
Rep. Michael Sells [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | House | House Rules "X" file. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2019-03-06 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-03-01 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-28 | House | TR - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-28 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 9:30 AM. |
2019-02-18 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5937 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-08 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=2070&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2070.pdf |