WA HB2085 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creating Mount St. Helens special license plates.
Title
Creating Mount St. Helens special license plates.
Sponsors
Rep. Ed Orcutt [R] | Rep. Brian Blake [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2020-02-19 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-16 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Transportation. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2019-03-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2019-03-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-05 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-03-01 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-28 | House | TR - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-28 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 9:30 AM. |
2019-02-18 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |