WA HB2104 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Health Care and Wellness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Health Care and Wellness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the integration of international medical graduates into Washington's health care delivery system.
Title
Concerning the integration of international medical graduates into Washington's health care delivery system.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-21 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5846 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-09 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=2104&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2104.pdf |