WA HB2115 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-02 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-02 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the composition of the officer promotion board.
Title
Concerning the composition of the officer promotion board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-31 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-31 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-02 | House | Effective date 6/12/2014. |
2014-04-02 | House | Chapter 178, 2014 Laws. |
2014-04-02 | House | Governor signed. |
2014-03-12 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-03-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | GOV - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First reading, referred to Governmental Operations. |
2014-01-31 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2014-01-31 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-01-30 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-01-27 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-01-23 | House | CDHT - Majority; do pass. |
2014-01-23 | House | CDHT - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-01-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community Development and Housing & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM. |
2014-01-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Community Development and Housing & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM. |
2014-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs |
2014-12-10 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5963 (Crossfiled) 2014-02-25 - Senate Rules "X" file.