WA HB2138 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring signage on certain lands that are closed to the public.
Title
Requiring signage on certain lands that are closed to the public.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Blake [D] | Rep. Joel Kretz [R] | Rep. Mike Chapman [D] | Rep. Tom Dent [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-18 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. |
2020-02-18 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-02-18 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-18 | House | Floor amendment |
2020-02-18 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-16 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-01-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-01-22 | House | RDAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-06 | House | First reading, referred to Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources. |