WA HB2158 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on December 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Including project lead-the-way examinations on the master list of postsecondary courses fulfilled by proficiency examinations.
Title
Including project lead-the-way examinations on the master list of postsecondary courses fulfilled by proficiency examinations.
Sponsors
Sen. Drew Hansen [D] | Rep. Marcie Maxwell [D] | Rep. Eric Pettigrew [D] | Rep. Larry Seaquist [D] |
Rep. Lawrence Springer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-01-09 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-12-12 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Higher Education at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-12-08 | First reading, referred to Higher Education. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5974 (Crossfiled) 2011-12-20 - Effective date 3/14/2012.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2158&year=2011 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2011-12/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2158.pdf |