WA HB2158 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-27 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-27 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning dropout prevention, intervention, and reengagement activities by educational service districts.
Title
Concerning dropout prevention, intervention, and reengagement activities by educational service districts.
Sponsors
Rep. Kathryn Haigh [D] | Rep. Larry Seaquist [D] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] | Rep. Chris Reykdal [D] |
Rep. Steve Tharinger [D] | Rep. Roger Freeman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-27 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2014-01-22 | House | ED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-01-22 | House | ED - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-01-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2014-01-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 11:00 AM. |
2014-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Education |
2014-01-07 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |