WA HB2171 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning vested vacation or paid time off upon an employee's termination.
Title
Concerning vested vacation or paid time off upon an employee's termination.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-21 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-16 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-11 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-11 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-11 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-11 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-10 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-01-30 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-01-30 | House | LAWS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-30 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-23 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-17 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. |