WA HB2188 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Effective date 1/1/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Effective date 1/1/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the types of commercial driver's license qualification waivers allowed for military veterans.
Title
Increasing the types of commercial driver's license qualification waivers allowed for military veterans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-16 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-16 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | House | Effective date 1/1/2021. |
2020-03-19 | House | Chapter 78, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-19 | House | Governor signed. |
2020-03-11 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2020-02-16 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-02-16 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-16 | House | Floor amendment |
2020-02-14 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-01-22 | House | TR - Majority; do pass. |
2020-01-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2019-12-03 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |