WA HB2193 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reauthorizing and expanding the financial fraud and identity theft crimes investigation and prosecution program.
Title
Reauthorizing and expanding the financial fraud and identity theft crimes investigation and prosecution program.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Kirby [D] | Rep. Morgan Irwin [R] | Rep. Christine Kilduff [D] | Rep. Mari Leavitt [D] |
Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] | Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] | Rep. Sharon Wylie [D] | Rep. Roger Goodman [D] |
Rep. Zack Hudgins [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-03 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-03 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-29 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-21 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-01-17 | House | CRJ - Majority; do pass. |
2020-01-17 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
2019-12-03 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6074 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-18 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=2193&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2193.pdf |