WA HB2197 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing an exception to the requirement that vehicle license plates be visible at all times for vehicles using certain cargo carrying devices.
Title
Establishing an exception to the requirement that vehicle license plates be visible at all times for vehicles using certain cargo carrying devices.
Sponsors
Rep. My-Linh Thai [D] | Rep. Bob McCaslin [R] | Rep. Amy Walen [D] | Rep. Vandana Slatter [D] |
Rep. Gael Tarleton [D] | Rep. Sherry Appleton [D] | Rep. Tina Orwall [D] | Sen. Sharon Shewmake [D] |
Rep. Sharon Wylie [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-16 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2020-02-16 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-02-16 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-14 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-01-29 | House | TR - Majority; do pass. |
2020-01-29 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2019-12-04 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |