WA HB2213 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying Washington state horse racing commission provisions.
Title
Modifying Washington state horse racing commission provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-23 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-01-21 | House | COG - Majority; do pass. |
2020-01-21 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming. |
2019-12-06 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=2213&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2213.pdf |