WA HB2217 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning cottage food product labeling requirements.
Title
Concerning cottage food product labeling requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-27 | House | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-27 | House | Chapter 171, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-27 | House | Governor signed. |
2020-03-11 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | AWNP - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. |
2020-02-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2020-02-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-04 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-01-24 | House | RDAN - Majority; do pass. |
2020-01-24 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources. |
2019-12-06 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |