WA HB2228 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Permitting early deployment of state fire service resources.
Title
Permitting early deployment of state fire service resources.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-18 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | SGTE - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | And refer to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | AWNP - Majority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. |
2020-02-18 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-02-18 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-18 | House | Floor amendment |
2020-02-14 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-11 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-11 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-11 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-11 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-08 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-06 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-20 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-01-17 | House | HOUS - Majority; do pass. |
2020-01-17 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Housing, Community Development & Veterans. |
2019-12-11 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |