WA HB2236 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning sales and use tax exemptions for large private airplanes.
Title
Concerning sales and use tax exemptions for large private airplanes.
Sponsors
Rep. Alex Ybarra [R] | Rep. Lawrence Springer [D] | Rep. Tom Dent [R] | Rep. Roger Goodman [D] |
Rep. Drew Stokesbary [R] | Rep. Larry Hoff [R] | Rep. Sharon Wylie [D] | Rep. Vicki Kraft [R] |
Rep. Ed Orcutt [R] | Rep. Morgan Irwin [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-26 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-01-30 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-01-28 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-01-28 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-01-28 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass. |
2020-01-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Finance. |
2019-12-12 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6068 (Crossfiled) 2020-04-02 - Effective date 6/11/2020*.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=2236&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2236.pdf |