WA HB2238 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Dividing the state wildlife account into the fish, wildlife, and conservation account and the limited fish and wildlife account.
Title
Dividing the state wildlife account into the fish, wildlife, and conservation account and the limited fish and wildlife account.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-21 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-14 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-01-27 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2020-01-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations. |
2019-12-12 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6072 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-25 - Effective date 7/1/2021.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=2238&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2238.pdf |