WA HB2246 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Effective date 6/11/2020*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Effective date 6/11/2020*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the reorganization of laws related to environmental health without making any substantive, policy changes.
Title
Concerning the reorganization of laws related to environmental health without making any substantive, policy changes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | House | Effective date 6/11/2020*. |
2020-03-18 | House | Chapter 20, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-18 | House | Governor signed. |
2020-03-11 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | ENET - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |
2020-02-19 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-02-19 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-19 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-17 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-01-23 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-01-21 | House | ENVI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-21 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Environment & Energy. |
2019-12-18 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |