WA HB2251 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the expiration date for notification of dispensing an interchangeable biological product.
Title
Concerning the expiration date for notification of dispensing an interchangeable biological product.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | House | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-18 | House | Chapter 21, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-18 | House | Governor signed. |
2020-03-09 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-05 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2020-02-19 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-02-19 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-17 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-01-24 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-01-24 | House | HCW - Majority; do pass. |
2020-01-24 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
2019-12-19 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |