WA HB2265 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminating exemptions from restrictions on the use of perfluoroalkyl and polyfluoroalkyl substances in firefighting foam.
Title
Eliminating exemptions from restrictions on the use of perfluoroalkyl and polyfluoroalkyl substances in firefighting foam.
Sponsors
Rep. Beth Doglio [D] | Rep. Mari Leavitt [D] | Sen. Sharon Shewmake [D] | Rep. Davina Duerr [D] |
Rep. Jake Fey [D] | Rep. Strom Peterson [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-16 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-16 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | House | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-18 | House | Chapter 23, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-18 | House | Governor signed. |
2020-03-09 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 36; nays, 12; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | ENET - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |
2020-02-16 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 92; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-02-16 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-16 | House | Floor amendment |
2020-02-16 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-14 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-01-30 | House | ENVI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-30 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-28 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Environment & Energy. |
2019-12-23 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6360 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-22 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM.