WA HB2270 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Adjusting stop signal requirements for school buses.
Title
Adjusting stop signal requirements for school buses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-21 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-14 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-01-29 | House | TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-29 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2019-12-23 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |