WA HB2277 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-03 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning youth solitary confinement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning youth solitary confinement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-03HouseEffective date 6/11/2020.
2020-04-03HouseChapter 333, 2020 Laws.
2020-04-03HouseGovernor signed.
2020-03-11HouseDelivered to Governor.
2020-03-10SenatePresident signed.
2020-03-07HouseSpeaker signed.
2020-03-05SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 36; nays, 13; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2020-03-05SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-03-04SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2020-03-02SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-03-02SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2020-03-02SenateMinority; do not pass.
2020-03-02SenateWM - Majority; do pass.
2020-03-02SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
2020-02-29SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM.
2020-02-27SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2020-02-26SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2020-02-26SenateHSRR - Majority; do pass.
2020-02-26SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 8:00 AM.
2020-02-20SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM.
2020-02-17SenateFirst reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation.
2020-02-13HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 76; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2020-02-13HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-02-13House2nd substitute bill substituted
2020-02-11HousePlaced on second reading.
2020-02-08HouseMinority; do not pass.
2020-02-08HouseAPP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2020-02-08HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2020-02-05HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
2020-01-28HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2020-01-24HouseMinority; do not pass.
2020-01-24HouseHSEL - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2020-01-24HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 8:00 AM.
2020-01-15HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM.
2020-01-13HouseFirst reading, referred to Human Services & Early Learning.
2019-12-24HousePrefiled for introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB6112 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=2277&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2277.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2277-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2277-S2.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/2277-S2.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/2277-S2.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=120787&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=02-13-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2277&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=120787&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-05-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2277&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback